$1,000.00
|
Andrew Reamer
| 05/06/2019 | Real Estate | Re/max Distinctive | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Barbara Schaufeld
| 08/29/2019 | Retired | Retired | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Benjamin Soto
| 11/14/2018 | President | Premium Title & Escrow LLC | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Buwa Binitie
| 12/02/2018 | Consultant | Dantes Partners | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Buwa Binitie
| 05/31/2019 | Consultant | Dantes Partners | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Charles Gordon Houston
| 04/18/2019 | Retired | Retired | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Charles Gordon Houston
| 10/12/2019 | Retired | Fieldstone Farm | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
David Jannarone
| 11/15/2018 | Real Estate | Taylor Adams Assoc | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Earle Horton
| 12/03/2018 | Attorney | Tiber Hudson LLC | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Emmanuel Bailey
| 09/05/2018 | Executive | Eti Inc | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Eric Magwood
| 10/05/2018 | Consultant | Self Employed | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Galvan Group LLC
| 09/12/2019 | | | ENTITY |
$1,000.00
|
George Ty Simpson
| 12/05/2018 | Real Estate Services | Spectrum Management | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Herschell Hamilton
| 01/28/2019 | Developer | Bloc Global Real Estate Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
James Stovall
| 10/16/2018 | Business Executive | Little Bird HR | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Jennifer Boysko
| 09/25/2019 | | | ENTITY |
$1,000.00
|
Joan M Kowalski
| 08/09/2019 | President | Bob Ross Inc | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Karen and Frederick Schaufeld
| 05/23/2019 | Nonprofit Management | Unemployed | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Kevin Ash
| 09/14/2019 | CEO | Ellisdale Construction | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Kingsley Obaji
| 09/03/2018 | Self Employed | Self Employed | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Leonard Stephens
| 12/30/2018 | Sports Business Owner | Self | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
LuAnn L Bennett
| 03/12/2019 | Real Estate Construction/developmt | Bennett Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Madeleine Albright
| 09/16/2019 | Consultant | Self | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000.00
|
Med Developers LLC
| 10/09/2018 | | | ENTITY |
$1,000.00
|
Mitra Setayesh
| 06/24/2019 | Chief Operating Officer | Ion International Training Center | INDIVIDUAL |