$2,500.00
|
Friends of Baylor Med
| 12/27/2018 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
Gilbert Garcia
| 10/29/2020 | Finance | Gha | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Grant Martin
| 10/15/2020 | Consultant | Self | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Greater Houston Builders Association
| 02/13/2020 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
James & Shirley Dannenbaum
| 10/20/2016 | President | Dannnenbaum Engineering | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
James Derrick
| 03/05/2020 | Unemployed | Unemployed | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
| 11/29/2017 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
| 02/21/2018 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
Lisa Peisen
| 09/02/2020 | Business | Self | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Lyndon L Olson Jr
| 09/28/2021 | Retired | None | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Pediatrix Medical Group, Inc. Texas Political Action Committee
| 12/08/2020 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
Meredith J Long
| 10/22/2015 | Owner | Meredith Long Gallery | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Meredith J Long
| 10/16/2016 | Owner | Meredith Long Gallery | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Meredith J Long
| 02/14/2018 | Owner | Meredith Long Gallery | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Meredith J Long
| 11/26/2018 | Owner | Meredith Long Gallery | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Nancy Allen
| 10/30/2019 | Retired | Self | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Oncor Political Action Committee of Oncor Electric Delivery Administration Corp.
| 10/22/2015 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
R Drayton McLane Jr
| 11/03/2015 | Chairman | Mclane Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
R Drayton McLane Jr
| 02/23/2018 | Chairman | Mclane Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
R Drayton McLane Jr
| 11/30/2020 | Chairman | Mclane Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Rafael Anchia
| 03/05/2020 | Managing Driector | Civitas Capital | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Robert & Janice McNair
| 12/05/2016 | Chairman & CEO | The Houston Texans | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Robert & Janice McNair
| 03/02/2018 | Chairman & CEO | The Houston Texans | INDIVIDUAL |
$2,500.00
|
Rodney Ellis
| 02/21/2018 | | | ENTITY |
$2,500.00
|
Sharone D Mayberry
| 10/30/2019 | President | Mayberry Homes Inc | INDIVIDUAL |